Langford, Grace Margaret (CPSO#: 61099)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Aug 1990

Summary

Former Name: Burrows, Grace Margaret (used until: 16 Nov 1994 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
444 Douro St. Suite 201
Stratford ON  N5A 0E6
Phone: 519 271 7172
Fax: 519 271 3124
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: GM Langford Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 14 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Langford ( CPSO# 61099 )

Business Address:
201 - 444 Douro Street
Stratford ON  N5A 0E6
Phone Number: (519) 271-7172

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GRACE MARGARET LANGFORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANGFORD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Sep 1991 to 30 Nov 1991
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 1990