Langill, Marc Vincent (CPSO#: 58389)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1929 Russell Rd.
Suite 216
Ottawa ON  K1G 4G3
Phone: (613) 235-2685
Fax: (613) 235-2688
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Marc Langill Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 05 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Langill ( CPSO# 58389 )

Business Address:
1929 Russell Road
Suite 216
Ottawa ON  K1G 4G3
Phone Number: (613) 235-2685

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Mar 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARC VINCENT LANGILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANGILL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1988