Langille, Heather Isobel (CPSO#: 67114)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: Smith, Heather Isobel (used until: 21 Jul 1997 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Dalhousie University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Civil Aviation Medicine
Transport Canada
Place de Ville Tower C
330 rue Sparks Street Room 617
Ottawa ON  K1A 0N8
Phone: (613) 990-1305
Fax: (613) 990-6623
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2052 St Joseph Boulevard
Orleans ON  K1C 1E6
Canada
Phone: 613-845-0084
Fax: 613-845-0079
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nova Scotia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 05 Dec 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HEATHER ISOBEL LANGILLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANGILLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 13 Mar 1996 to 12 Mar 1997
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1995