Langley, Jean Elizabeth (CPSO#: 33278)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1982 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 May 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 May 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013