Langley, Joanne Marie (CPSO#: 55304)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 23 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Dalhousie University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 09 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 05 Sep 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Jul 1990