Langley, Richard Graham Ballantyne (CPSO#: 62468)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 01 Oct 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Oct 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1992 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1991
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 01 Oct 2001