Langlois, Elizabeth Anne (CPSO#: 32451)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Carette Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 24 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Langlois ( CPSO# 32451 )
Dr. S. Carette ( CPSO# 32421 )

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
EW-1-422 - 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-6751

Medical Records Location

Address: Mount Sinai Hospital, 600 University Avenue, Toronto, ON M5G 1X5
Date Received: 29 May 2017

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 1 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jan 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 May 1998
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: September 14, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the voluntary cease-to-practise Undertaking given by Dr. Elizabeth Anne Langlois to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective September 14, 2015:

Dr. Langlois has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine due to retirement and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.