Langlois, Patrice (CPSO#: 73221)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jan 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jan 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kilborn Medical Center
Suite 315
1385 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1H 8N4
Phone: (613) 860-6777
Fax: (613) 860-1777
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

100 Chemin Rockland
Bureau 110
Montreal QC  H3P 2V9
Canada
Phone: (514) 667-3383
Fax: (514) 667-3834
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICE LANGLOIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANGLOIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 11 Jan 1999 to 04 Apr 1999
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Apr 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jan 2005