Langlois, William John (CPSO#: 59453)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2401 Bristol Circle
Suite 101
Oakville ON  L6S 5S9
Phone: (905) 569-3007
Fax: (905) 569-2054
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Langlois Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 20 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Langlois ( CPSO# 59453 )

Business Address:
505 - 2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone Number: (905) 569-3007

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 03 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 03 Sep 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM JOHN LANGLOIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANGLOIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1989