Langner, Neima Rochelle (CPSO#: 31863)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Nov 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Nov 1994

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Richard F. Davies Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 13 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Langner ( CPSO# 31863 )
Dr. R. Davies ( CPSO# 50366 )

Business Address:
University of Ottawa Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
H2247B
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone Number: (613) 761-4729

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Community Medicine Effective: 05 Dec 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NEIMA ROCHELLE LANGNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANGNER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Nov 1994