Lannigan, Robert (CPSO#: 31719)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jan 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jan 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Middlesex-London Health Unit STI Clinic 50 King Street London, ON N6A 5L7
Date Received: 03 Dec 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Mar 1979 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Microbiology Effective: 23 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jan 2016