Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Lantos, Gabor (CPSO#: 58200)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hungarian

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3280 Bloor St. W. #802
Center Tower 8th floor
Toronto ON  M8X 2X3
Phone: (416) 410-5018
Fax: (416) 229-0177
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Providence Health Care,Toronto Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GABOR LANTOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANTOS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1988