Lapena, Hilario Samson (CPSO#: 85736)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Nov 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Nov 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cebuano, English, Tagalog, Visayan

Education:University of The East Philippines, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Taunton Health Centre
1290 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone: (905) 721-6895
Fax: (905) 721-6688
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Elsa Lapena Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 07 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Lapena ( CPSO# 85736 )
Dr. U. Lapena ( CPSO# 80956 )

Business Address:
Taunton Health Centre
1290 Keith Ross Drive
3rd Floor
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone Number: (905) 721-4164


Corporation Name: Dr. Hilario Lapena Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 11 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Lapena ( CPSO# 85736 )
Dr. U. Lapena ( CPSO# 80956 )

Business Address:
Taunton Health Centre
1290 Keith Ross Court
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone Number: (905) 721-6895

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Nov 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HILARIO SAMSON LAPENA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAPENA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Nov 2006 to 23 Jan 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 24 Jan 2007 to 31 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Nov 2007 to 20 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Oct 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 2008