Laperriere, John Normand Paul (CPSO#: 31398)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Nov 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Nov 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Hospital
Suite 5 961
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-2127
Fax: (416) 946-2227
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Normand Laperriere Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 10 2012

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 05 Dec 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN NORMAND PAUL LAPERRIERE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAPERRIERE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 1985