Lapin, Jonathan Louis (CPSO#: 68301)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Aug 1994

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2630 Kipling Ave
Toronto ON  M9B 4B9
Phone: (416) 748-8434
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

294 Main St.
Unit B1
Toronto ON  M4C 4X5
Canada
Phone: (416) 691-5071
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: JL Lapin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 14 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lapin ( CPSO# 68301 )

Business Address:
2630 Kipling Avenue
Toronto ON  M9V 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 748-8434

Business Address:
B1 - 294 Main Street
Toronto ON  M4C 4X5
Phone Number: (416) 691-5071

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JONATHAN LOUIS LAPIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAPIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 1994