Lapinsky, Stephen Earl (CPSO#: 64625)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Sep 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jan 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Suite 18 214
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 3211
Fax: (416) 586-8480
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

491 Lawrence Ave West
Toronto ON  M5M 1C7
Canada
Phone: (416) 781-9500
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stephen Lapinsky Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 11 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Lapinsky ( CPSO# 64625 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
18-214 - 600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Business Address:
Suite 500
491 Lawrence Avenue West
North York ON  M5M 1C7
Phone Number: (416) 781-9500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN EARL LAPINSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAPINSKY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 1993