Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Lapointe, Marc Henry (CPSO#: 66313)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 May 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 May 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
9 Notre-Dame Sud
Ville Marie QC  J9V 1X3
Phone: (819) 629-3179
Fax: (819) 629-3179
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

C M H A
20 May Street South
P O Box 249
New Liskeard ON  P0J 1P0
Canada
Phone: (705) 647-4444
Fax: (705) 647-4434
County: Territorial District of Timiskaming
Electoral District: 08

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Englehart and District Hospital Englehart
Kirkland and District Hospital Kirkland Lake
Notre-Dame Hospital Hearst
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 22 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARC HENRY LAPOINTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAPOINTE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 May 1993