Lapointe-Shaw, Lauren (CPSO#: 91040)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Health Network
Toronto General Hospital
14 Eaton North - 213
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3155
Fax: (416) 595-5826
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chartier & Lapointe-Shaw Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 09 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Chartier ( CPSO# 91035 )
Dr. L. Lapointe-Shaw ( CPSO# 91040 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
RFE GS 480
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3856

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
14 Eaton North - 213
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3155

Business Address:
Suite FP 1-503
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5405

Business Address:
Suite 1NW-126
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6165

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAUREN LAPOINTE-SHAW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAPOINTE-SHAW is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013