Laporta, Donald Philip (CPSO#: 87602)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 24 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 20 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2007
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2011