Lapp, Jonathan Frederick (CPSO#: 52051)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 May 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Halton Healthcare Services
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lapp Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 13 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lapp ( CPSO# 52051 )

Business Address:
Halton Healthcare
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L8M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Medical Records Location

Address: Oakmed Family Health Team Suite 110 231 Oak Park Boulevard Oakville ON L6H 7S8Tel: (905) 901-5111
Instructions: Patients seeking a copy/transfer of their medical records can contact the above address
Date Received: 15 May 2017

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1985 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 03 Nov 2010 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JONATHAN FREDERICK LAPP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAPP is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 May 1983