Lapp, Timothy John (CPSO#: 61222)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Huntsville Professional Building
348 Muskoka Road 3 North
Suite 206
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H8
Phone: (705) 787-0333
Fax: (705) 787-1808
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Timothy Lapp Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 15 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Lapp ( CPSO# 61222 )

Business Address:
Huntsville Professional Building
Suite 206
348 Muskoka Road 3 North
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H8
Phone Number: (705) 787-0333

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TIMOTHY JOHN LAPP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAPP is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1990