Lappa-Walker, Tracy Arlene (CPSO#: 66878)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jan 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jan 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stonegate CHC
150 Berry Road
Toronto ON  M8Y 1W3
Phone: (416) 231-7070
Fax: (416) 231-6903
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Dec 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TRACY ARLENE LAPPA-WALKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAPPA-WALKER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 15 Dec 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Dec 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 1996