Laramee, Louise Anne (CPSO#: 51440)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: 613-746-4621 Ext. 4125
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ottawa Heart Institute
40 Ruskin street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Canada
Phone: 613-696-7000
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 30 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LOUISE ANNE LARAMEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LARAMEE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1988