Larche, Margaret Jean (CPSO#: 86015)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Mar 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 13 Mar 2007

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Bristol, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 702
25 Chalton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Phone: (905) 528-0489
Fax: (905) 528-0450
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

McMaster University Hospital
1200 Main St W
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Canada
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 75382
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Larche Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 07 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Larche ( CPSO# 86015 )

Business Address:
702-25 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Phone Number: (905) 308-8319

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective: 13 Mar 2007 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 13 Mar 2007 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 01 Sep 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 05 Sep 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Mar 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 24 Mar 2016 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Margaret  Jean  Larche may practise medicine independently in rheumatology
            and clinical immunology and allergy.