Lareau, Christian (CPSO#: 67692)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Shawville Hospital
Shawville QC  J0X 2Y0
Phone: (819) 647-2211
Fax: (819) 647-6814
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

CISSO DE HULL
116 Lionel-Emond Boulevard
Gatineau QC  J8Y 1W7
Canada
Phone: (819) 966-6028
Fax: (819) 966-6076
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Records Location

Address: 185 Rue Laurier PO Box 1704 Gatineau, QC J8X 0B2
Date Received: 11 May 2018

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 05 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 1994
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018