Laredo, Esther Sheila (CPSO#: 63940)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Women's College Hospital
Endocrine Program
76 Grenville Street
3rd Floor
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 323-6400 Ext. 3298
Fax: (416) 323-6534
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

4 The Market Place
East York ON  M4C 5M1
Canada
Phone: (416) 690-3412
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E. S. Laredo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 26 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Laredo ( CPSO# 63940 )

Business Address:
4 The Market Place
Toronto ON  M4C 5M1
Phone Number: (416) 690-3412

Business Address:
Suite 5451
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-6400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 06 Sep 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ESTHER SHEILA LAREDO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAREDO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1992