Larouche, Jeremie Stephane (CPSO#: 91078)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEREMIE STEPHANE LAROUCHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAROUCHE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Jul 2015
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2014