Larsen, Darren Andrew (CPSO#: 61037)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Family Practice Health Centre
Women's College Hospital
3rd Floor
77 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B3
Phone: 416-323-6060
Fax: 416-323-6350
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Larsen Morse Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 27 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Morse ( CPSO# 63692 )
Dr. D. Larsen ( CPSO# 61037 )

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
Family Practice Health Centre 3rd Floor
77 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B3
Phone Number: (416) 323-6060

Business Address:
18 Centre Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 1E9
Phone Number: (905) 889-3634

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 13 Nov 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DARREN ANDREW LARSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LARSEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1990