Larson, Joseph Robert (CPSO#: 103502)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
245 Dixon Rd
Etobicoke ON  M9P 2M4
Phone: 647-777-1166
Fax: 647-777-1165
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1 Eglinton Ave E #400
Toronto ON  M4P 3A1
Canada
Phone: (416) 636-7377
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joseph Larson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Larson ( CPSO# 103502)
Dr. A. Mackey ( CPSO# 103497)

Business Address:
245 Dixon Road
Etobicoke ON  M9P 2M4
Phone Number: (647) 777-1166

Business Address:
400 - 1 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4P 3A1
Phone Number: (416) 636-7377

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEPH ROBERT LARSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LARSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2016