Larton, Heather Allison (CPSO#: 70062)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Sep 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Aug 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Wilfred Laurier University
Health Services
2nd Floor Student Services Building
75 University Avenue West
Waterloo ON  N2L 3C5
Phone: (519) 884-0710 Ext. 3146
Electoral District: 03

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HEATHER ALLISON LARTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LARTON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1998
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Sep 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Nov 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 12 Nov 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2016

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 12 Nov 2012
Summary:

On November 12, 2012, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Heather Allison Larton 
committed acts of professional misconduct, in that she failed without reasonable cause to provide 
a report or certificate relating to an examination or treatment performed by her to her patient or 
her authorized representative within a reasonable time after the patient or her authorized 
representative requested such a report or certificate and she failed to respond appropriately or 
within a reasonable time to a written inquiry from the College; and in that she engaged in 
conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the 
circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or 
unprofessional. 
 
Dr. Larton currently practises family medicine in Waterloo, Ontario. Between 1998 and 2008, Ms 
X was Dr. Larton's patient at her practice in Sudbury, Ontario. Commencing on April 15, 2004, 
Ms X, through her legal counsel, requested copies of Dr. Larton's clinical notes and records. Ms 
X's counsel required the clinical notes and records in furtherance of litigation related to two car 
accidents in which Ms X was involved. In total, Ms X's counsel sent Dr. Larton 14 requests of 
increasing urgency over the course of four years. 
 
In 2008, Dr. Larton closed her practice in Sudbury. As Ms X had yet to obtain a copy of her 
clinical notes and records, she complained to the College. Ms X's new family physician could not 
complete her application for CPP Disability Benefits without Dr. Larton's clinical notes and 
records. In addition, litigation relating to the two car accidents was unable to proceed. Upon 
receipt of the complaint letter on August 20, 2008, College staff made attempts to contact Dr. 
Larton to secure the delivery of Ms X's patient records. Dr. Larton failed to respond to Ms X's 
records request or to her complaint letter, despite repeated requests by the College that she do so. 
On the eve of the Discipline hearing scheduled to commence on March 7, 2012, Dr. Larton 
retained counsel and requested an adjournment. She subsequently located and delivered the 
patient's chart to her.   
 
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:  
 
      the Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Larton's 
      certificate of registration: 
 
      i.     Dr. Larton shall obtain a clinical supervisor, being a Director, office manager or 
            other person in a comparable role, at each location at which she practices 
            ("Clinical Supervisor(s)"), who is acceptable to the College and who has signed an 
            undertaking in the form attached to the Order as Appendix A.  The Clinical 
            Supervisor(s) shall report to the College on a quarterly basis in respect of Dr. 
            Larton's office management, administrative, organizational and communications 
            skills; 
      ii.   Dr. Larton shall abide at her own expense with the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s 
            recommendations with respect to her practice, including with respect to any 
            practice improvements and/or ongoing professional development and/or 
            education; 
 
iii.  If a Clinical Supervisor who has given an undertaking is unwilling or unable to 
      continue to fulfill its terms, Dr. Larton shall, within 30 days, obtain an 
      undertaking in the same form from a person who is acceptable to the College; 
iv.   If Dr. Larton is unable to obtain a Clinical Supervisor at a location at which she 
      practices as set out in (i) or (iii) above, Dr. Larton shall cease to practice at that 
      location immediately until such time as she has obtained a Clinical Supervisor at 
      that location acceptable to the College; and 
v.    If, at any time after two years have passed since the Order, every one of Dr. 
      Larton's Clinical Supervisor(s) is or are of the opinion that Dr. Larton's office 
      management, administrative, organizational and communications skills are such 
      that there is no further purpose to be served by clinical supervision, such clinical 
      supervision shall be discontinued only upon: 
              
      (a)   An assessment of Dr. Larton's practice at her primary practice location, 
            undertaken by a College-appointed assessor at Dr. Larton's expense, the 
            results of which are satisfactory to the College; and 
      (b)   The approval of the College.   
              
vi.   Dr. Larton shall be solely responsible for all fees, costs and expenses associated 
      with her compliance with the terms of this Order. 
              
Dr. Larton attend before this panel to be reprimanded. 
              
Dr. Larton pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650.00 within 60 days of the date 
of this order. 
              
              

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): November 12, 2012