Laryea, Eric Adja (CPSO#: 22637)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Oct 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Oct 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 10 Mar 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1965
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1966
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jan 1997
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Oct 1999