Las Heras, Facundo Aliciardi (CPSO#: 82016)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 17 Apr 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Apr 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Chile, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Nov 2004 to 23 Jan 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 24 Jan 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 17 Apr 2010
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Dec 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 17 Apr 2010