Laschuk, Maria Juliana (CPSO#: 51057)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1986

Summary

Former Name: Mayer, Maria Juliana (used until: 06 Sep 1983 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1720 Howard Avenue
Suite 350
Windsor ON  N8X 5A6
Phone: (519) 255-9792
Fax: (519) 255-9908
Electoral District: 01
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Canada
Phone: (519) 254-1661 Ext. 52201
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Southwestern Oral Surgery
200-860 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8X 2S5
Canada
Phone: (519) 258-1231
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

3315 Banwell Rd.
Suite 100
Windsor ON  N8N 0B6
Canada
Phone: (519) 979-7900
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Laschuk Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 23 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Laschuk ( CPSO# 106141)
Dr. B. Laschuk ( CPSO# 51123 )
Dr. M. Laschuk ( CPSO# 51057 )

Business Address:
100 - 3315 Banwell
Windsor ON  N8N 0B6
Phone Number: (519) 979-7900

Business Address:
Suite 350
1720 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 5A6
Phone Number: (519) 255-9792

Business Address:
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Business Address:
Suite 200
860 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8X 2S5
Phone Number: (519) 258-1231

Business Address:
1453 Prince Road
Windsor ON  N9C 3Z4

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 02 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIA JULIANA LASCHUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LASCHUK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1986