Lashevsky, Ilan (CPSO#: 75699)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Apr 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Apr 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Italian

Education:Tel Aviv University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room D304A
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 7383
Fax: (416) 480-6913
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3080 Yonge Street
unit 4076
Toronto ON  M4N 3N1
Canada
Phone: (647) 347-6644
Fax: (647) 347-6647
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

9600 bathurst st
Vaughan ON  L6A 3Z8
Canada
Phone: (416) 588-3788
Fax: (416) 588-5633
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. I. Lashevsky Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 10 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Lashevsky ( CPSO# 75699 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room D304A
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Israel

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 01 Apr 2006 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Mar 2006
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Mar 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Mar 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Apr 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Mar 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Apr 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 18 Apr 2013 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Ilan Lashevsky may practise medicine independently in cardiology, only.