Laskey, Jennifer Dallas (CPSO#: 65330)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Centenial Medical Center
299 Lake Avenue East
Carleton Place ON  K7C 1J3
Phone: (613) 257-2311
Fax: (613) 257-4435
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.D. Laskey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Laskey ( CPSO# 65330 )

Business Address:
Centennial Medical Centre
299 Lake Avenue
Carleton Place ON  K7C 1J3
Phone Number: (613) 257-2311

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Dec 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER DALLAS LASKEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LASKEY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1993