Laszlo, Theodore Anthony (CPSO#: 19439)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd. Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place Toronto, Ontario M9L 0A3 Tel: 1-800-775-0093 Fax: (647) 933-2904 Website: www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 05 Nov 2012


Address:  Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: The Information and Privacy Commissioner's Office Tel: (416) 326-3333 or toll free at 1 (800) 387-0073
Date Received: 25 Sep 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 16 Nov 1965 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Apr 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 May 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Aug 2012