Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Lathwell, Margaret Janet Smith (CPSO#: 66143)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Pennsylvania State University Coll of Me, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Regent Park Community Health Center 465 Dundas Street East Toronto, ON M5A 2B2
Date Received: 15 May 2015

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015