Latif, Shazia (CPSO#: 82210)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Mar 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Mar 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 200
1225 Maple Avenue
Milton ON  L9T 0A5
Phone: (905) 693-6400
Fax: (905) 693-6405
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shazia Latif Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 29 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Latif ( CPSO# 82210 )

Business Address:
Suite 200
1225 Maple Avenue
Milton ON  L9T 0A5
Phone Number: (905) 693-6400

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Feb 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAZIA LATIF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LATIF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 2005 to 21 May 2005
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 22 May 2005 to 28 Feb 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 2006 to 28 Feb 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 May 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2007