Latosinsky, Steven (CPSO#: 72733)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 May 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 May 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Regional Cancer Centre
P O Box 5165 Room A3 931C
790 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4L6
Phone: (519) 685-8740
Fax: (519) 685-8744
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S Latosinsky Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 04 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Latosinsky ( CPSO# 72733 )

Business Address:
London Regional Cancer Centre
Suite A3 931C
790 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4L6
Phone Number: (519) 685-8740

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 04 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEVEN LATOSINSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LATOSINSKY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Feb 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 May 2009