Latour, Anne Helen (CPSO#: 24453)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 20 Nov 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Nov 1997

Summary

Former Name: Lewandowski, Anne Helen Latour (used until: 11 Jan 1983 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 07 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Nov 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1991
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 20 Nov 1997