Latour, Catherine (CPSO#: 105078)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 02 Nov 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Nov 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Laval University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 18 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 03 Nov 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Transfusion Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 02 Nov 2015
Clinical Fellow - Transfusion Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Nov 2015