Latta, Eleanor Katrin (CPSO#: 70366)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Sep 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Laboratory Medicine
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 360-4000 Ext. 2370
Fax: (416) 864-5648
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELEANOR KATRIN LATTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LATTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2001