Lattanzio, Pierre-Jean (CPSO#: 81102)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2 Crescent Park West
Warren PA  16365
United States
Phone: (814) 406-0035
Fax: (814) 726-9412

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York
USA - Pennsylvania

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PIERRE-JEAN LATTANZIO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LATTANZIO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 11 Apr 2011 to 31 Jul 2011
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Aug 2011 to 31 Oct 2011
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009