Lau, Anita Sum-Yee (CPSO#: 84935)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CHEO
Division of Emergency Medicine
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 3955
Fax: 613-738-4885
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Lau Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 02 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lau ( CPSO# 84935 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Division of Emergency Medicine
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANITA SUM-YEE LAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 06 Jun 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Oct 2008
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2008