Lau, Chung-Yan (CPSO#: 67911)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Mar 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Mar 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:McMaster University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Gastroenterology Effective: 26 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 1999 to 31 Mar 1999
Elective Trainee - Medical Microbiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 1999