Lau, David Che Wai (CPSO#: 30990)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jul 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Jun 2016