Lau, Eddy Chi-Ho (CPSO#: 69999)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Nov 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:Queen's University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Village Park Paediatrics
Suite 405
27 Roncesvalles Avenue
Toronto ON  M6R 3B2
Phone: (416) 516-4111
Fax: (416) 516-1104
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Saint Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Canada
Phone: (416) 530-6000 Ext. 4549
Fax: (416) 530-6294
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Department of Pediatric Emergency
Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Canada
Phone: (416) 813-7500
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lau Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 19 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Lau ( CPSO# 69999 )

Business Address:
Village Park Paediatrics
Suite 405
27 Roncesvalles Avenue
Toronto ON  M6R 3B2
Phone Number: (416) 516-4111

Business Address:
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Business Address:
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-5807

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 07 Nov 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDDY CHI-HO LAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2000