Lau, Helena Lee-Wah (CPSO#: 66625)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Aug 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 300
690 Dorval Drive
Oakville ON  L6K 3W7
Phone: (905) 338-5428
Fax: (905) 337-2551
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

470 Chrysler Drive
Unit 12
Brampton ON  L6S 1C0
Canada
Phone: (905) 790-9030
Fax: (905) 790-7487
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Helena Lau Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 04 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Lau ( CPSO# 66625 )

Business Address:
12 - 470 Chrysler Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 1C0
Phone Number: (905) 790-9030

Business Address:
Suite 300
690 Dorval Drive
Oakville ON  L6K 3W7
Phone Number: (905) 338-5428

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 06 Oct 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HELENA LEE-WAH LAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 20 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1997