Lau, Ho Yin (CPSO#: 63379)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Aug 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Dec 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 601
3601 Highway 7 East
Markham ON  L3R 0M3
Phone: (905) 940-0112
Fax: (905) 940-9271
Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Hong Kong S A R

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 21 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HO YIN LAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Feb 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Dec 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 1995