Lau, Jonathan Wei-Ming (CPSO#: 96131)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Division of Orthopedic Surgery
Victory 3
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666
Electoral District: 06

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JONATHAN WEI-MING LAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2017